Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Antonio Bandini Mazuelos

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1814Born
18 Feb 184227.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lima, Peru
19 Feb 184227.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
15 May 187964.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
15 May 187964.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Antipatris
21 Sep 187965.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antipatris
27 May 188974.9AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
11 Aug 188975.1InstalledArchbishop of Lima, Peru
11 Apr 189883.8DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Manuel Antonio Bandini Mazuelos
Archbishop Manuel Antonio Bandini Mazuelos (born , died ) Archbishop of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima
Ordained BishopLima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 110, and Page 342
  • b: LB, 7 Feb 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017