Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco de Sales Arrieta Ortiz, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1768BornLima
17 Nov 179123.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
18 Nov 179123.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
4 Nov 183971.8SelectedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
13 Jul 184072.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
24 Jan 184173.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lima, Peru
4 May 184375.3DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Sales Arrieta Ortiz:
Archbishop Francisco de Sales Arrieta Ortiz O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Lima

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 239
  • c01: LB, 26 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013