Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco de Asis Orueta y Castrillón, C.O. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1804BornLima
1821²16.2ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
9 Oct 182925.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
11 Oct 182925.0Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
14 Jul 185550.8SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
28 Sep 185551.0ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
28 Sep 185551.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Aegae
23 Dec 185551.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aegae
11 Aug 185954.8SelectedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
26 Sep 185955.0ConfirmedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
21 Mar 187368.5AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
25 Aug 188681.9DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Asis Orueta y Castrillón:
Archbishop Francisco de Asis Orueta y Castrillón C.O. (born , died ) Archbishop of Lima

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 78, and Page 342
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 569

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Sep 2014