Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomé Manuel Herrera Vélez

Deceased

Bishop of Arequipa, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1808Born
1829²20.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lima, Peru
1832²23.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
11 Aug 185950.9SelectedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
26 Sep 185951.0ConfirmedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
29 May 186051.7Ordained BishopBishop of Arequipa, Peru
6 Jan 186152.3InstalledBishop of Arequipa, Peru
10 Aug 186455.9DiedBishop of Arequipa, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé Manuel Herrera Vélez (VIAF: 69987085)
Bishop Bartolomé Manuel Herrera Vélez (born , died ) Bishop of Arequipa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima
Ordained BishopS. Pedro, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a priest for 32.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 119
  • od/op/c1+: LB, 30 Jan 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jan 2017