Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Ruiz Zumaeta

Deceased

Bishop of Chachapoyas, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1813Born
26 Jul 184027.4Ordained PriestPriest of Chachapoyas, Peru
15 Jun 185239.3SelectedBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru
12 Sep 185340.5ConfirmedBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru
27 Dec 185441.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru
20 Nov 186249.7DiedBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru

MicroData Summary for Pedro Ruiz Zumaeta
Bishop Pedro Ruiz Zumaeta (born , died ) Bishop of Chachapoyas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChachapoyas
Ordained BishopTrujillo, Diocese of Trujillo

  • a priest for 22.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LB, 30 Jan 2013
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 197
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1854, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017