Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustín Guillermo Charún Espinoza

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1794BornLima
7 Mar 181824.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lima, Peru
19 Sep 181824.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
15 Jun 185258.3SelectedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
7 Mar 185359.1ConfirmedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
31 Jul 185359.5Ordained BishopBishop of Trujillo, Peru
22 Feb 185763.0DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru

MicroData Summary for Agustín Guillermo Charún Espinoza:
Bishop Agustín Guillermo Charún Espinoza (born , died ) Bishop of Trujillo

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 569
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: LB, 6 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013