Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Arriaga

Deceased

Bishop of Chachapoyas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1786BornPiura
21 Sep 180923.4Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jun 183650.2SelectedBishop of Maynas, Peru
17 Sep 183852.4ConfirmedBishop of Maynas, Peru
1 Jan 184053.7Ordained BishopBishop of Maynas, Peru
12 Jan 184154.7InstalledBishop of Maynas, Peru
15 Dec 184963.7DiedBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru

MicroData Summary for José María Arriaga
Bishop José María Arriaga (born , died ) Bishop of Chachapoyas

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LB, 30 Jan 2013
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 147, and Page 258
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Oct 2016