Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Garcia Irigoyen

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1857Born
21 Nov 188023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
21 Mar 191052.3AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
19 Jun 191052.6Ordained BishopBishop of Trujillo, Peru
21 Oct 193779.9DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru

MicroData Summary for Carlos Garcia Irigoyen
Bishop Carlos Garcia Irigoyen (born , died ) Bishop of Trujillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • c1: LB, 31 Jan 2013
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,910, Number 51
  • c2+: CB, 3 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,254

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast