Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mariano Jacinto Valdivia y Ortiz

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Huancayo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1895BornMiraflores
14 Jul 192933.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 194045.3AppointedBishop of Huaraz, Peru
2 Mar 194145.5Ordained BishopBishop of Huaraz, Peru
17 Dec 195661.3AppointedBishop of Huancayo, Peru
30 Jun 196670.8AppointedArchbishop of Huancayo, Peru
10 Feb 197175.4RetiredArchbishop of Huancayo, Peru
30 Jun 198286.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Huancayo, Peru

MicroData Summary for Mariano Jacinto Valdivia y Ortiz:
Archbishop Mariano Jacinto Valdivia y Ortiz (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Huancayo

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1941, Number 12
  • ab/arch/huan: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 58, Page 662

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013