Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Neri Menor Vargas, O.F.M.

Bishop of Huánuco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1960 BornPacopampa
31 Mar 199130.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
25 Jan 199837.6Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
20 Mar 200039.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
12 May 201655.9AppointedBishop of Huánuco, Peru
17 Jul 201656.1Ordained BishopBishop of Huánuco, Peru

MicroData Summary for Neri Menor Vargas
Bishop Neri Menor Vargas O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Huánuco

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Huánuco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 May 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 10 Jun 2016
  • c2+: CB, 27 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,063

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Oct 2016