Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franziskus Eisenbach

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mainz

Titular Bishop of Sigus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1943 BornStrzelce Opolskie
30 Jul 196724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
17 Mar 198844.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
17 Mar 198844.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sigus
24 Apr 198844.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sigus
16 Apr 200258.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franziskus Eisenbach:
Bishop Franziskus Eisenbach (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mainz

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mainz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,624

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015