Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Markus Büchel

Bishop Emeritus of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1949 Born
3 Apr 197626.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
6 Jul 200656.9AppointedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
17 Sep 200657.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
22 May 202575.7RetiredBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland

MicroData Summary
Markus Büchel
Bishop Markus Büchel
(born )
Bishop Emeritus of Sankt Gallen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRüthi
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sankt Gallen, Diocese of Sankt Gallen

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sankt Gallen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2006
  • ob: CB
  • c3+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,246
  • r: Bollettino, 22 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 22 May 2025