Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Joseph Dooley

Bishop of Dunedin, New Zealand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1961 Born
13 Dec 198928.0Ordained PriestPriest of Dunedin, New Zealand
22 Feb 201856.1AppointedBishop of Dunedin, New Zealand
26 Apr 201856.3Ordained BishopBishop of Dunedin, New Zealand
27 Apr 201856.3InstalledBishop of Dunedin, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for Michael Joseph Dooley
Bishop Michael Joseph Dooley (born ) Bishop of Dunedin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceInvercargill, Diocese of Dunedin
Ordained BishopTown Hall, Dunedin, Diocese of Dunedin

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dunedin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2018
  • ob/i: CB, 7 Mar 2018
  • c2+: CB, 26 Apr 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,770

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast