Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Colin David Campbell

Bishop Emeritus of Dunedin, New Zealand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1941 Born
27 Jun 196624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Dunedin, New Zealand
29 Apr 200462.6AppointedBishop of Dunedin, New Zealand
9 Jul 200462.7Ordained BishopBishop of Dunedin, New Zealand
22 Feb 201876.4RetiredBishop of Dunedin, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for Colin David Campbell (VIAF: 165741446)
Bishop Colin David Campbell (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Dunedin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDunedin, Diocese of Dunedin
Ordained BishopTown Hall, Dunedin, Diocese of Dunedin

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dunedin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,651
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 22 Feb 2018