Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonard Anthony Boyle

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dunedin


from Cathedral Web Site

from Cathedral Web Site

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1930BornNightcaps
29 Jun 196130.6Ordained PriestPriest of Dunedin, New Zealand
27 Jan 198352.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Dunedin, New Zealand
3 May 198352.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Dunedin, New Zealand
10 Jul 198554.6SucceededBishop of Dunedin, New Zealand
19 Aug 198554.7InstalledBishop of Dunedin, New Zealand
24 May 200473.5ResignedBishop of Dunedin, New Zealand
1 Jun 201685.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Dunedin, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for Leonard Anthony Boyle
Bishop Leonard Anthony Boyle (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dunedin

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 31 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 May 2016