Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Thomas Stafford Cardinal Williams

Archbishop Emeritus of Wellington

Cardinal-Priest of Ges¨ Divin Maestro alla Pineta Sacchetti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1930 BornWellington
20 Dec 195929.7Ordained PriestPriest of Wellington, New Zealand
30 Oct 197949.6AppointedArchbishop of Wellington, New Zealand
20 Dec 197949.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Wellington, New Zealand
2 Feb 198352.8Elevated to Cardinal
2 Feb 198352.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Ges¨ Divin Maestro alla Pineta Sacchetti
1 Jun 199565.1AppointedBishop of New Zealand, Military
21 Mar 200575.0RetiredArchbishop of Wellington, New Zealand
1 Apr 200575.0RetiredBishop of New Zealand, Military

MicroData Summary for Thomas Stafford Williams:
Thomas Stafford Cardinal Williams (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Wellington

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Wellington.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 14 Feb 2015