Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Max Takuira Matthew Mariu, S.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Hamilton in New Zealand

Titular Bishop of Decoriana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1952BornTaumarunui
197623.4Solemn ProfessedMember of Society of Mary
30 Apr 197724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
30 Jan 198835.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hamilton in New Zealand
30 Jan 198835.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Decoriana
19 Mar 198835.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Decoriana
12 Dec 200553.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Hamilton in New Zealand

MicroData Summary for Max Takuira Matthew Mariu:
Bishop Max Takuira Matthew Mariu S.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Hamilton in New Zealand

  • a priest for 28.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,805
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,551
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 28 Dec 2013