Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Mackey

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Auckland, New Zealand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1918Born
23 Nov 194123.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Apr 197456.2AppointedBishop of Auckland, New Zealand
30 Jun 197456.4Ordained BishopBishop of Auckland, New Zealand
1 Jan 198364.9ResignedBishop of Auckland, New Zealand
20 Jan 201496.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Auckland, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for John Mackey
Bishop John Mackey (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Auckland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBray, Ireland
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 72.1 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 20 Jan 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 24, Number 1,375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast