Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Russell Gaines

Deceased

Bishop of Hamilton in New Zealand

Bishop of New Zealand, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1926BornWanganui
13 Jul 195023.6Ordained PriestPriest of Wellington, New Zealand
28 Oct 197649.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Auckland, New Zealand
28 Oct 197649.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Domnach Sechnaill
8 Dec 197650.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Domnach Sechnaill
6 Mar 198053.3AppointedBishop of Hamilton in New Zealand
19 Jun 198154.6AppointedBishop of New Zealand, Military
6 Sep 199467.8DiedBishop of Hamilton in New Zealand

MicroData Summary for Edward Russell Gaines:
Bishop Edward Russell Gaines (born , died ) Bishop of Hamilton in New Zealand

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015