Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Owen Noel Snedden

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wellington

Titular Bishop of Achelous

Bishop of New Zealand, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1917BornAuckland
24 Feb 194123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Auckland, New Zealand
23 May 196244.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wellington, New Zealand
23 May 196244.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Achelous
22 Aug 196244.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Achelous
28 Oct 197658.9AppointedBishop of New Zealand, Military
17 Apr 198163.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wellington, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for Owen Noel Snedden:
Bishop Owen Noel Snedden (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wellington

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013