Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Jerome Cunneen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Christchurch


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1932BornAshburton
8 Jul 195624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Christchurch, New Zealand
6 Oct 199260.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
6 Oct 199260.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Eanach Dúin
30 Nov 199260.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eanach Dúin
15 Dec 199563.6AppointedBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
19 Mar 199663.9InstalledBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
4 May 200775.0RetiredBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
9 Nov 201078.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Christchurch, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for John Jerome Cunneen:
Bishop John Jerome Cunneen (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Christchurch

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 May 2007
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,990
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013