Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stuart France O’Connell, S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rarotonga, Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1935Born
27 Jul 196025.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
8 Nov 199661.4AppointedBishop of Rarotonga, Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
22 Feb 199761.7Ordained BishopBishop of Rarotonga, Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
11 Apr 201175.9RetiredBishop of Rarotonga, Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
2 Aug 201984.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Rarotonga, Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Stuart France O’Connell
Bishop Stuart France O’Connell S.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rarotonga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLower Hutt, New Zealand
Ordained BishopSaint Joseph, Cathedral, Rarotonga, Diocese of Rarotonga, Cook Islands
Death PlaceAuckland, Diocese of Auckland, New Zealand

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,927
  • d: CB, 5 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 8 Aug 2019

Quantcast