Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robin Walsh Leamy, S.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Rarotonga, Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1934 Born
21 Jul 195823.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
9 Jan 198449.4AppointedBishop of Rarotonga, Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
7 Apr 198449.6Ordained BishopBishop of Rarotonga, Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
8 Nov 199662.2ResignedBishop of Rarotonga, Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Robin Walsh Leamy
Bishop Robin Walsh Leamy S.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Rarotonga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWellington, Archdiocese of Wellington, New Zealand
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Cook Island, Diocese of Rarotonga, Cook Islands

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rarotonga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • auxb/auck: CB, 3 Aug 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,199

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast