Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Hugh Brown, C.SS.R.

Bishop of Samoa-Pago Pago, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1947 Born
16 Feb 196921.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
26 Oct 197527.9Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
19 Dec 198134.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
31 May 201365.5AppointedBishop of Samoa-Pago Pago, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
22 Aug 201365.7Ordained BishopBishop of Samoa-Pago Pago, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Peter Hugh Brown
Bishop Peter Hugh Brown C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop of Samoa-Pago Pago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGreymouth, New Zealand

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Samoa-Pago Pago.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2013
  • c1: CB, 31 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 22 Aug 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,851

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast