Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Quinn Weitzel, M.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Samoa-Pago Pago, American Samoa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1928 BornChicago, IL, USA
11 Jun 195527.1Ordained PriestPriest of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
9 Jun 198658.1AppointedBishop of Samoa-Pago Pago, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
29 Oct 198658.5Ordained BishopBishop of Samoa-Pago Pago, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
31 May 201385.1RetiredBishop of Samoa-Pago Pago, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for John Quinn Weitzel:
Bishop John Quinn Weitzel M.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Samoa-Pago Pago

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Samoa-Pago Pago.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013