Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles Daniel Balvo

Apostolic Nuncio to Kenya

Titular Archbishop of Castello

Apostolic Nuncio to South Sudan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1951 BornBrooklyn, NY, USA
6 Jun 197624.9Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
1 Apr 200553.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Castello
1 Apr 200553.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to New Zealand
1 Apr 200553.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Fiji, Pacific (Oceania)
1 Apr 200553.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Marshall Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
1 Apr 200553.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Micronesia, Federated States of, Pacific (Oceania)
1 Apr 200553.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Vanuatu, Pacific (Oceania)
1 Apr 200553.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Tonga, Pacific (Oceania)
1 Apr 200553.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Kiribata, Pacific (Oceania)
1 Apr 200553.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Palau, Pacific (Oceania)
29 Jun 200554.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Castello
25 Mar 200654.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
1 Apr 200654.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
30 Jan 200755.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nauru, Pacific (Oceania)
17 Jan 201361.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Kenya
21 Dec 201362.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to South Sudan

MicroData Summary for Charles Daniel Balvo:
Archbishop Charles Daniel Balvo (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Kenya

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Kenya.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,908
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Jan 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 21 Dec 2013