Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pascal Chang-Soi, SS.CC.

Bishop of Taiohae o Tefenuaenata, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1966 Born
23 Aug 199225.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
9 Nov 199731.0Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
4 Feb 200033.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
4 Aug 201043.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Taiohae o Tefenuaenata, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
4 Dec 201044.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Taiohae o Tefenuaenata, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
22 Mar 201346.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Papeete, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
28 Aug 201548.8CeasedApostolic Administrator of Papeete, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
5 Sep 201548.8SucceededBishop of Taiohae o Tefenuaenata, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Pascal Chang-Soi
Bishop Pascal Chang-Soi SS.CC. (born ) Bishop of Taiohae o Tefenuaenata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTahiti

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Taiohae o Tefenuaenata.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Aug 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,868
  • ab: CB, 25 Mar 2013
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Aug 2015
  • s: Bollettino, 5 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017