Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hubert Coppenrath

Archbishop Emeritus of Papeete, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1930 Born
22 Dec 195626.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Tahiti {Isole Tahiti}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
27 Jun 195726.6Ordained PriestPriest of Tahiti {Isole Tahiti}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
21 Nov 199767.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Papeete, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
21 Feb 199867.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Papeete, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
4 Jun 199968.6SucceededArchbishop of Papeete, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
31 Mar 201180.4RetiredArchbishop of Papeete, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Hubert Coppenrath (VIAF: 2591921)
Archbishop Hubert Coppenrath (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Papeete

EventPlace
Birth PlacePapeete
Ordained DeaconSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Papeete.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,243
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 Jul 2018

Quantcast