Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul-Laurent-Jean-Louis Mazé, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Papeete, French Polynesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1885BornPleyben, France
25 Sep 191025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
8 Nov 193853.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tahiti {Isole Tahiti}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
8 Nov 193853.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
30 Apr 193954.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
21 Jun 196681.2AppointedArchbishop of Papeete, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
5 Mar 197387.9RetiredArchbishop of Papeete, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
21 Dec 197691.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Papeete, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Paul-Laurent-Jean-Louis Mazé:
Archbishop Paul-Laurent-Jean-Louis Mazé SS.CC. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Papeete

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013