Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Pierre Edmond Cottanceau, SS.CC.

Archbishop of Papeete, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1953 Born
11 Sep 197118.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
16 Apr 197926.2Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
10 May 198027.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
28 Aug 201562.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Papeete, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
5 Sep 201562.6InstalledApostolic Administrator of Papeete, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
15 Dec 201663.9AppointedArchbishop of Papeete, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
18 Feb 201764.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Papeete, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre Edmond Cottanceau
Archbishop Jean-Pierre Edmond Cottanceau SS.CC. (born ) Archbishop of Papeete

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUssel, Diocese of Tulle, France
Ordained BishopMaria no te Hau, Church, Papeete, Archdiocese of Papeete, French Polynesia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Papeete.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2016
  • b: CB, 15 Dec 2016
  • ob: CB, 20 Dec 2016
  • c2+: CB, 14 Jan 2017
  • mn: AJ, 17 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Mar 2017