Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Susitino Sionepoe, S.M.

Bishop of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1965 Born
28 Nov 199328.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
24 Dec 201853.9AppointedBishop of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna, Pacific (Oceania)
24 Mar 201954.2Ordained BishopBishop of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Susitino Sionepoe
Bishop Susitino Sionepoe S.M. (born ) Bishop of Wallis et Futuna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVaitupu (Hihifo), Vicariate Apostolic of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mata Utu, Wallis Island, Diocese of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wallis et Futuna.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Dec 2018
  • ob: CB, 29 Jan 2019
  • c2+: CB, 13 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 27 Mar 2019

Quantcast