Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean (John) Bosco Baremes, S.M.

Bishop of Port-Vila, Vanuatu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1960 BornHan, Isola Carteret, Papua New Guinea
18 Jan 198120.4Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Society of Mary
4 Dec 198727.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
18 Nov 200949.2AppointedBishop of Port-Vila, Vanuatu, Pacific (Oceania)
14 Feb 201049.5Ordained BishopBishop of Port-Vila, Vanuatu, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Jean (John) Bosco Baremes:
Bishop Jean (John) Bosco Baremes S.M. (born ) Bishop of Port-Vila

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Port-Vila.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,574

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013