Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Magnoni

Deceased

Apostolic Pro-Nuncio Emeritus to Egypt, Arab Republic of

Titular Archbishop of Boseta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1919Born
11 Apr 194323.8Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 198060.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Boseta
24 Apr 198060.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to New Zealand
24 Apr 198060.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Fiji, Pacific (Oceania)
1 Jun 198060.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Boseta
22 Jul 198970.1AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Egypt, Arab Republic of
18 Mar 199575.7RetiredApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Egypt, Arab Republic of
18 Mar 200787.7DiedApostolic Pro-Nuncio Emeritus to Egypt, Arab Republic of

MicroData Summary for Antonio Magnoni
Archbishop Antonio Magnoni (born , died ) Apostolic Pro-Nuncio Emeritus of Egypt, Arab Republic of

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNonantola, Italy

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018