Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Murphy

Bishop Emeritus of Kerry


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1936 BornAnnaghmore
18 Jun 196125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Kerry, Ireland
17 Jun 199559.0AppointedBishop of Kerry, Ireland
10 Sep 199559.3Ordained BishopBishop of Kerry, Ireland
2 May 201376.9RetiredBishop of Kerry, Ireland

MicroData Summary for William Murphy:
Bishop William Murphy (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kerry

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kerry.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,607
  • r: Bollettino, 2 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013