Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriel Gonsum Ganaka

Deceased

Archbishop of Jos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1937BornPankshin
4 Jul 196528.1Ordained PriestPriest of Jos, Nigeria
17 May 197335.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jos, Nigeria
17 May 197335.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cuicul
9 Sep 197336.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cuicul
5 Oct 197437.3AppointedBishop of Jos, Nigeria
26 Mar 199456.8AppointedArchbishop of Jos, Nigeria
11 Nov 199962.4DiedArchbishop of Jos, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Gonsum Ganaka:
Archbishop Gabriel Gonsum Ganaka (born , died ) Archbishop of Jos

  • a priest for 34.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015