Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Malachy John Goltok

Deceased

Bishop of Bauchi, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1965Born
4 Nov 199025.3Ordained PriestPriest of Jos, Nigeria
18 Mar 201145.6AppointedBishop of Bauchi, Nigeria
19 May 201145.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bauchi, Nigeria
21 Mar 201549.6DiedBishop of Bauchi, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Malachy John Goltok
Bishop Malachy John Goltok (born , died ) Bishop of Bauchi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBauchi

  • a priest for 24.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2011
  • ob: CB, 11 Apr 2011
  • c1+: CB, 24 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,058
  • d: CB, 21 Mar 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018