Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip Davou Dung

Bishop of Shendam, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1958 Born
24 Nov 198426.2Ordained PriestPriest of Jos, Nigeria
5 Nov 201658.2AppointedBishop of Shendam, Nigeria
11 Jan 201758.3Ordained BishopBishop of Shendam, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Philip Davou Dung
Bishop Philip Davou Dung (born ) Bishop of Shendam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKuru Station, Archdiocese of Jos
Ordained BishopCentenary Grounds, Sacred Heart Cathedral, Shendam, Diocese of Shendam

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Shendam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Nov 2016
  • ob: CB, 19 Nov 2016
  • c2: CB, 8 Jan 2017
  • c34: CB, 11 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jan 2017