Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Amelio Poggi

Deceased

Apostolic Pro-Nuncio to Syria

Titular Archbishop of Cercina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1914Born
8 Aug 193722.8Ordained PriestPriest
27 May 196752.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cercina
27 May 196752.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Burundi
27 May 196752.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Rwanda
16 Jul 196752.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cercina
5 Aug 196752.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Uganda
27 Nov 196955.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Central-Western Africa
26 Sep 197358.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Syria
23 Dec 197460.2DiedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Syria

MicroData Summary for Amelio Poggi
Archbishop Amelio Poggi (born , died ) Apostolic Pro-Nuncio of Syria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBibbiena

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 435, Ascendance
  • ab: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 59, Page 879, and Page 1,072
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 841, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 984, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast