Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Walsh

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tuam, Ireland

Titular Archbishop of Tubernuca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1888Born
21 Jun 191425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Tuam, Ireland
16 Dec 193748.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tuam, Ireland
16 Dec 193748.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Coela
2 Jan 193849.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coela
16 Jan 194051.0AppointedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
31 Jan 196980.1RetiredArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
31 Jan 196980.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tubernuca
20 Jun 197283.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tuam, Ireland

MicroData Summary
Joseph Walsh
Archbishop Joseph Walsh
(born , died )
Archbishop Emeritus of Tuam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNewport, Archdiocese of Tuam
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tuam, Archdiocese of Tuam
Death PlaceTuam, Archdiocese of Tuam

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1938, Number 1
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 1, Number 43
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 96, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.2, 10 May 2025; Data: 17 May 2025