Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Naughton

Deceased

Bishop of Killala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1865BornBallina
24 Jun 188924.5Ordained PriestPriest of Killala, Ireland
27 Nov 191146.9AppointedBishop of Killala, Ireland
7 Jan 191247.0Ordained BishopBishop of Killala, Ireland
16 Feb 195085.1DiedBishop of Killala, Ireland

MicroData Summary for James Naughton:
Bishop James Naughton (born , died ) Bishop of Killala

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 38.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013