Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Ryan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Clonfert, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1915Born
10 Jul 193823.4Ordained PriestPriest
9 May 196348.2AppointedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
16 Jun 196348.3Ordained BishopBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
1 May 198267.2ResignedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
20 Aug 198368.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Clonfert, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Thomas Ryan
Bishop Thomas Ryan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Clonfert

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilcommon

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018