Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Hanly

Deceased

Bishop of Elphin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1899Born
17 Jun 192324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Elphin, Ireland
19 Jul 195051.2AppointedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
24 Sep 195051.4Ordained BishopBishop of Elphin, Ireland
9 Nov 197071.5DiedBishop of Elphin, Ireland

MicroData Summary
Vincent Hanly
Bishop Vincent Hanly
(born , died )
Bishop of Elphin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSmith Hill House, Ardnagowna, Diocese of Elphin
Ordained PriestMaynooth, Archdiocese of Dublin
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Sligo, Diocese of Elphin
Death PlaceGarden Hill Nursing Home, Boyle, Diocese of Elphin
Buried Place (Original)Grounds of, Immaculate Conception, Cathedral, Sligo, Diocese of Elphin

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1950, Number 76
  • loc: CB, 16 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.2, 10 May 2025; Data: 17 May 2025