Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francis Carroll, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Monrovia, Liberia

Titular Archbishop of Gabula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1912Born
20 Dec 193624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
27 Oct 195038.3AppointedPrefect of Cape Palmas, Liberia
20 Dec 196048.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Monrovia, Liberia
20 Dec 196048.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto
21 May 196148.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto
9 Nov 196149.4AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Liberia
14 Jan 196451.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gabula
7 Mar 196653.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Liberia
28 Oct 197664.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Monrovia, Liberia
25 Aug 197967.2ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Liberia
10 Oct 198068.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Monrovia, Liberia

MicroData Summary for Francis Carroll
Archbishop Francis Carroll S.M.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Monrovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNewry, Ireland

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast