Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Lyons

Deceased

Bishop of Kilmore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1875Born
19 Jun 189823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Armagh, Ireland
6 Aug 193762.2AppointedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
3 Oct 193762.3Ordained BishopBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
26 Apr 194973.9DiedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Patrick Lyons
Bishop Patrick Lyons (born , died ) Bishop of Kilmore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCollon

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast