Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edouard Rostaing, M.S. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Antsirabé

Titular Bishop of Curium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1879BornNovalaise, France
24 Feb 194262.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Antsirabé, Madagascar
24 Feb 194262.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Curium
27 May 194262.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Curium
18 May 1946³66.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Antsirabé, Madagascar

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edouard Rostaing:
Bishop Edouard Rostaing M.S. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Antsirabé

  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013