Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alain-Sébastien Le Breton, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Toamasina

Titular Bishop of Salona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1888BornPlobannalec, France
1 Jan 191829.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
8 Oct 193546.9AppointedPrefect of Vatomandry, Madagascar
25 May 193950.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hypselis
25 May 193950.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tamatave, Madagascar
7 Oct 193950.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hypselis
14 Sep 195566.8AppointedBishop of Toamasina, Madagascar
15 Mar 195768.3ResignedBishop of Toamasina, Madagascar
15 Mar 195768.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Salona
16 Dec 196476.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Toamasina, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Alain-Sébastien Le Breton:
Bishop Alain-Sébastien Le Breton S.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Toamasina

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015