Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Givelet, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Fianarantsoa, Madagascar

Titular Bishop of Gindarus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1857Born
8 Sep 188932.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
16 May 191355.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Fianarantsoa, Madagascar
16 May 191355.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Gindarus
2 Oct 191356.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gindarus
9 Dec 193578.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Fianarantsoa, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Charles Givelet
Bishop Charles Givelet S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Fianarantsoa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReims, France

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast