Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurent Marie Étienne Monnier

Deceased

Bishop of Troyes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1847Born
27 Sep 187123.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 Oct 190759.7AppointedBishop of Troyes, France
21 Nov 190759.9Ordained BishopBishop of Troyes, France
7 Jul 192779.5DiedBishop of Troyes, France

MicroData Summary for Laurent Marie Étienne Monnier
Bishop Laurent Marie Étienne Monnier (born , died ) Bishop of Troyes

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoligny

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017