Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Alexandre Maillet

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Claude, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1854Born
29 Jun 187723.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 189844.1SelectedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
24 Mar 189844.1ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
29 Jun 189844.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Claude, France
1 Nov 192571.8DiedBishop of Saint-Claude, France

MicroData Summary for François-Alexandre Maillet (VIAF: 7382235)
Bishop François-Alexandre Maillet (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Claude

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBourges, Archdiocese of Bourges
Ordained BishopCathedral, Dijon, Diocese of Dijon
Death PlaceSaint-Claude, Diocese of Saint-Claude

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 208
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Jun 2017