Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel-Henri Canonne, A.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tuléar, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1911Born
12 Jun 194331.4Ordained PriestPriest of Augustinians of the Assumption
25 Apr 195947.3AppointedBishop of Tuléar, Madagascar
25 Oct 195947.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tuléar, Madagascar
28 Feb 197462.1ResignedBishop of Tuléar, Madagascar
30 Apr 199179.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Tuléar, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Michel-Henri Canonne
Bishop Michel-Henri Canonne A.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tuléar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLe Câteau, France

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast